THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 7:47:25 AM
Kale, Rajendra Dhundiraj
CPSO#:
90060
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jun 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Bombay, 1977
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Dec 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 29 Aug 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Nov 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Sep 2014 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 22 Sep 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2022 |