skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/10/21 15:16:26 PM

Omar, Amer Alaa Mostafa Kamal

CPSO#: 90037

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Sep 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Institut de la Rétine Médicale
2170 Rene Levesque West, Bureau 101
Montreal, Quebec
Montreal QC  H3H 2T8
Phone: 5143280218 Ext. 301
Fax: 5143280219

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMER ALAA MOSTAFA KAMAL OMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2011