THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 23:00:02 PM
Bonan, Raoul Isaac
CPSO#:
90026
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
30 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Paris, 1974
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Sep 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Oct 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Dec 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Dec 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 06 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 05 Apr 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2011 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 30 Jul 2015 |