THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 2:18:15 AM
Diaz, Roberto Jose
CPSO#:
90020
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 May 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
EL - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 16 Nov 2009 to 10 Jan 2010
EL - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Jan 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 May 2013 |