THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/10/23 7:41:30 AM
You, Benoit
CPSO#:
90011
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Apr 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
14 Jan 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Universite de Lyon I, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2008 to 13 Jan 2009
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Apr 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Apr 2010 |