THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
18/04/24 22:53:05 PM
Ens, Andrea Rae Doris
CPSO#:
90009
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
27 Oct 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON N6A 5W9
Phone: 5196858138
Fax: 519-685-8105
Electoral District: 02
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. James Brokenshire Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 21 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Bluewater Health |
Sarnia |
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Endocrinology and Metabolism |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANDREA RAE DORIS ENS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ENS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2008 to 14 Dec 2008
EL - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Ottawa, 26 Oct 2009 to 20 Nov 2009
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2010 to 12 Mar 2010
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 01 Jan 2016
CF - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Mar 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2015 |