THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 8:37:46 AM
Ivanova, Liudmila
CPSO#:
89982
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Nov 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 May 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Tver State Medical Academy, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Dundas Valley Medical Centre
107 King Street West, Suite 204
Dundas ON L9H 1V1
Phone: (905) 627-3505
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:14 Dec 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Public Health and Preventive Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LIUDMILA IVANOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IVANOVA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2008 to 24 Jan 2009
AVP - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jan 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2012 |