skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 01/12/21 20:35:52 PM

Duigenan, Shauna

CPSO#: 89947

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Apr 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8L6
Phone: 613-798-5555 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

499 Raglan St N
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

566 Louise St
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Canada
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

7 St. Francis Memorial Dr
Barrys Bay ON  K0J 1B0
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

75 Spring St
Almonte ON  K0A 1A0
Canada
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

350 John St N
Arnprior ON  K7S 2P6
Canada
County: County of Renfrew
Electoral District: 07

1 Ring Rd, Iqaluit NU X0A 0H0
Iqaluit NU  X0A 0H0
Canada
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Duigenan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Duigenan ( CPSO# 89947 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9


Corporation Name: Carriere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 28 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Carriere ( CPSO# 89329 )
Dr. S. Duigenan ( CPSO# 89947 )

Business Address:
204 - 595 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 4L2
Phone Number: (613) 695-9933

Business Address:
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
1111 Ghislain Street
Prescott ON  K6A 3E5
Phone Number: (613) 632-1111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAUNA DUIGENAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DUIGENAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
EL - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2011