THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 6:50:33 AM
Riyaz, Samreen Hasan
CPSO#:
89937
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Dow Medical College, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
7758 Kent Boulevard
Brockville ON K6V 7J9
Phone: (613) 498-3030
Fax: (866) 860-8155
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brockville General Hospital |
Brockville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Feb 2011 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMREEN HASAN RIYAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIYAZ is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Jan 2009 to 19 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 20 Dec 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 14 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Feb 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Feb 2011 |