THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 16:58:06 PM
Awan, Sobia Faisal
CPSO#:
89934
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
05 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
10 John Birchall Road
Richmond Hill ON L4S 0B2
Phone: (905) 780-2400
Fax: (905) 780-2401
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Markham Stouffville Hospital |
Markham |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:21 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SOBIA FAISAL AWAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AWAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2008 to 12 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 13 Jan 2009 to 20 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 21 Oct 2009 to 18 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 05 Jan 2011 |