skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 03/10/23 9:43:03 AM

Akintan, Olabode Olanrewaju

CPSO#: 89916

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Oct 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Oct 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education: UNIVERSITY OF JOS, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
203C-407 Speers Rd
Oakville ON  L6K 3T5
Phone: 9053382882
Fax: 9059173522 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Olabode Akintan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 01 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akintan ( CPSO# 89916 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
McMaster Children's Hospital
Dept Psych & Behavioural Neurosci
1200 Main Street West Room 3G88
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
83 Byron St
Oakville ON  L6J 6E6


Corporation Name: Dr. Nnamdi Ugwunze Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akintan ( CPSO# 89916 )
Dr. N. Ugwunze ( CPSO# 110668)

Business Address:
1001 Queen St W
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Forensic Division
Unit 3, Room 453
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: 416 535 8501

Business Address:
Southwest Centre For Forensic
410 Sunset Drive
St Thomas ON  N5R 3C6
Phone Number: (519) 631-8510

Business Address:
St Josephs Health Care
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 851-7695

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  April 30, 2021
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On April 30, 2021, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College, pursuant to s.85.5 (2) of the Health Professions Procedural Code, and section 33(d) of the Public Hospitals Act, that Dr. Olabode Olanrewaju Akintan had taken a voluntary leave of absence from his clinical duties at Hamilton Health Sciences, effective April 5, 2021.
 
On December 7, 2022, Hamilton Health Sciences notified the College that Dr. Akintan is transitioning his practice at the hospital to outpatient virtual care.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:22 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. OLABODE OLANREWAJU AKINTAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKINTAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 29 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2009