skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 1:06:46 AM

Ahooja, Vineeta

CPSO#: 89907

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 17 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 412
1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone: (416) 281-9499
Fax: (416) 283-5705 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

2nd Floor
235 Salem Road
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Canada
Phone: (905) 426-8333
Fax: (905) 426-4447
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vineeta Ahooja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 31 2018
Corporation Name: Vineeta Ahooja Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ahooja ( CPSO# 89907 )

Business Address:
235 Salem Road
Suite E-5
Ajax ON  L1Z 0B1
Phone Number: (905) 426-8333

Business Address:
250 Marlee Avenue
Toronto ON  M6B 1N6
Phone Number: (416) 283-0000

Business Address:
2640 Rutherford Road
Vaughan ON  L6A 4N9
Phone Number: (905) 417-3001

Business Address:
Rouge Valley Cardiology
412 - 1371 Neilson Road
Scarborough ON  M1B 4Z8
Phone Number: (416) 281-9499

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:17 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Cardiology Effective:17 Jul 2009 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Sep 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Mar 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 18 Nov 2010

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010 Active
             Dr. Vineeta Ahooja may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
            cardiology, only.