THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 17:18:03 PM
Suh, Daniel
CPSO#:
89899
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
06 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
06 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Nottingham, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network
General Campus
3050 Lawrence Street East
Scarborough ON M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Scarborough Health Network Centenary |
Toronto |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:05 Oct 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) |
Effective:10 Aug 2019 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DANIEL SUH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2008 to 28 Dec 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 29 Dec 2008 to 05 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 06 Oct 2009 to 05 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Dec 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 06 Oct 2010 |