skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/05/22 1:26:51 AM

Gulati, Meena

CPSO#: 89898

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 May 2022
EXPIRY DATE
04 May 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Oct 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education: Lady Hardinge Medical College, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Meena Gulati Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 9 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Georgia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 2022