THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/10/23 1:12:53 AM
Shefrin, Allan Evan
CPSO#:
89865
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
Div of Paediatric Emergency Med
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALLAN EVAN SHEFRIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEFRIN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Oct 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2010 |