skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 30/06/22 12:52:18 PM

Oroz, Budimka

CPSO#: 89848

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 05 Sep 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, Serbian

Education: University of Sarajevo, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Budimka Oroz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 19 2022
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Patients seeking a copy of their medical record may write to:

Rideau Valley Health Centre
1221 Greenbank Road
Ottawa, ON, K2J 5V7
Date Received: 09 Mar 2022


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Prince Edward Island

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BUDIMKA OROZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OROZ is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2008