THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 13:37:23 PM
Yang, Yee Kwan
CPSO#:
89830
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Nov 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English, Mandarin
Education: Li Ka Shing Faculty of Medicine, Univers, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Angel Kids Pediatrics
Suite 210, 5293 Highway 7 E
Markham ON L3P 7M7
Phone: 905 472 5326
Fax: 905 472 5017
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:19 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. YEE KWAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 03 Sep 2008 to 16 Sep 2008
PEAP - R - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 17 Sep 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2015 |