THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/09/23 0:27:33 AM
Zeller, Jeanne Therese
CPSO#:
89813
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jan 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Jan 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Universite of Rene Descartes (Paris V), 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
Division of Dermatology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6043
Fax: (416) 530-6050
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Dermatology |
Effective:15 Nov 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2008 to 17 Nov 2008
PEAP - CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 18 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Dermatology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 14 Jan 2011
CF - Dermatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Jan 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
|
Active |