THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:35:37 AM
Robbins, Anthony James
CPSO#:
89783
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: St. George's University School of Medici, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Owen Sound Family health team @ 519-470-3030
Date Received: 31 May 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:26 Aug 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANTHONY JAMES ROBBINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBBINS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2010 |