THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:07:33 PM
Susil, Monica Hana
CPSO#:
89747
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Aug 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Czech, English, French
Education: Saba University School of Medicine, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
25 Black Lake Road
Lively ON P3Y 1J3
Phone: (705) 692-1018
Fax: (705) 692-7156
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:18 Aug 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MONICA HANA SUSIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SUSIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Aug 2008 to 16 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 17 Nov 2008 to 24 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 25 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 29 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 25 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2010 |