THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/09/23 1:24:28 AM
Charman, Sandra Marcela
CPSO#:
89743
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Sep 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: National University of Colombia, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2951 Walker's Line
2nd Floor
Burlington ON L7M 4Y1
Phone: 905-634-1625
Fax: 905-634-5332
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:01 Sep 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SANDRA MARCELA CHARMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 25 Nov 2008 to 01 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 02 Sep 2009 to 01 Sep 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 02 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2010 |