THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:24:46 AM
Deen, Hurara
CPSO#:
89741
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Oct 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Khursheed, Abuhurara (used until: 22 Nov 2011 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Universidad Techologica De Santiago, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON L6L 2X4
Phone: 905-582-7777
Fax: 905-215-2154
Electoral District: 04
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records may contact 289-400-2626
Date Received: 04 Nov 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HURARA DEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DEEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2008 to 24 Nov 2008
AVP - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 25 Nov 2008 to 08 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 09 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Oct 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2011 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 06 Dec 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 25 Jan 2017 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2017 |