THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 6:08:22 AM
Chhibber, Siddharth
CPSO#:
89738
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
19 Dec 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
19 Dec 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Kasturba Medical College, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Stratford General Hospital - DI Dep
46 General Hospital Road
Stratford, ON
N5A 2Y8
London ON N5A 2Y8
Phone: 519-272-8210
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Alexandra Marine and General Hospital |
Goderich |
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance |
Chatham |
Clinton Public Hospital |
Clinton |
Four Counties Health Services |
Newbury |
Hanover and District Hospital |
Hanover |
Listowel Memorial Hospital |
Listowel |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre |
Kincardine |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site |
Chesley |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Durham-Memorial Site |
Durham |
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Walkerton Site |
Walkerton |
South Huron Hospital Association |
Exeter |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
St Mary's Memorial Hospital |
St Marys |
St Thomas-Elgin General Hospital |
St Thomas |
Stratford General Hospital |
Stratford |
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital |
Strathroy |
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital |
Tillsonburg |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Wingham and District Hospital |
Wingham |
Woodstock Hospital |
Woodstock |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:04 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SIDDHARTH CHHIBBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHHIBBER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 13 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 14 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2014 |