THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 10:51:13 AM
Halder, Smita Luna Sudeshna
CPSO#:
89699
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
05 Jul 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
05 Jul 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
McMaster University
Department of Medicine
1280 Main Street West
H S C 3V34
Hamilton ON L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76764
Fax: (905) 526-0594
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 Jul 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Gastroenterology |
Effective:05 Jul 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 23 Oct 2008
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 24 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Oct 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Jul 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2017 |
|
Active |