THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:59:28 PM
Narayansingh, Marc Jevan
CPSO#:
89662
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Aug 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Aug 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3N5
Phone: (416) 480-6100 Ext. 7547
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARC JEVAN NARAYANSINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NARAYANSINGH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 29 Aug 2008
EL - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 31 Aug 2011
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Aug 2010 |