THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/09/23 1:08:54 AM
Nambiar, Sindhu
CPSO#:
89660
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Mar 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
29 Mar 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Malayalam
Education: Calicut University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Etobicoke General Hosptial
Department of Internal Medicine
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 747-3400
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:29 Mar 2010 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 04 Aug 2008 to 01 Feb 2009
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Sep 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Feb 2012 |
|
Active |