THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 14:58:52 PM
Khurshid, Faiza
CPSO#:
89657
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
04 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
04 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: King Edward Medical College, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Kingston Health Sciences Center
Watkins 3
Room 4 3 218
76 Stuart St
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3729
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Pakistan
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Kingston Health Sciences Centre |
Kingston |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:12 Sep 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine |
Effective:12 Sep 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 01 Sep 2013
CF - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Apr 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Sep 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jan 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Sep 2019 |
|
Active |