THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 8:17:16 AM
Rondi, Kevin
CPSO#:
89647
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Aug 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
20 Dec 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Sep 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Aug 2008
EL - Respirology
McMaster University, 02 Feb 2009 to 28 Feb 2009
EL - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2009 to 29 Apr 2009
EL - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Feb 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2012 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Aug 2014 |