THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:43:58 PM
Moreno Garijo, Jacobo
CPSO#:
89623
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: University of Valencia, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
L122-2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre /
Department of Anesthesia and Pain M
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-4864
Fax: 416-480-6039
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:08 Jan 2021 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jan 2021 |
|
Active |