skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 25/07/21 14:57:48 PM

Vezi, Zwelithini Brian

CPSO#: 89619

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 14 Aug 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Natal, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 16 Jul 2008 to 12 Aug 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 13 Aug 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010