THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
06/06/23 2:36:21 AM
Jamal, Zeeya
CPSO#:
89610
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Feb 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Feb 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1770 Woodward Dr
Ottawa ON K2C3J2
Phone: 6137552095
Fax: 6137316201
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kemptville District Hospital |
Kemptville |
Oak Valley Health - Uxbridge Hospital |
Uxbridge |
Queensway Carleton Hospital |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZEEYA JAMAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAMAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 09 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 10 Jul 2009 to 09 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 14 Sep 2015 to 04 Dec 2015
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Jul 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Feb 2011 |