THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 21:26:46 PM
Bandsma, Robertus Hermanus Johannes
CPSO#:
89609
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
10 Dec 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Dec 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dutch, English
Education: State University of Groningen, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology, Hepat
Department of Pediatrics
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500 Ext. 309057
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:18 Dec 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 17 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 18 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Dec 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Sep 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2020 |
|
Active |