THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 9:02:00 AM
Boyle, Shawna Lee
CPSO#:
89599
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Jun 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Unknown
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Calgary, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Nebraska
USA - North Carolina
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Cortellucci Vaughan Hospital |
Vaughan |
Mackenzie Health |
Richmond Hill |
Timmins and District Hospital |
Timmins |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Urology |
Effective:25 May 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAWNA LEE BOYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BOYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jun 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 13 Aug 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Jun 2021 |