THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/09/23 8:39:59 AM
Hamodat, Mowafak Mohamed Abdul Jabar
CPSO#:
89595
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
09 Sep 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Sep 2019
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Sheikh Khalifa Medical city
Alkaramah street
P.O.BOX 767317
Abu Dhabi 767317
United Arab Emirates
Phone: 97128192894
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Arab Emirates
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:08 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MOWAFAK MOHAMED ABDUL JABAR HAMODAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMODAT is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 25 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Sep 2019 |