THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:57:18 PM
Sacevich, Tegan Fulford
CPSO#:
89578
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care Group
35 Algoma St N
Thunder Bay ON P7B 5G7
Phone: 807 346-2310
Fax: 807 345-5126
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TEGAN FULFORD SACEVICH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SACEVICH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 19 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2010 |