THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 13:58:40 PM
Stan, Florentina
CPSO#:
89558
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Sep 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Sep 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
5500 North Service Road
Unit 104
Burlington ON L7L 6W6
Phone: (905) 333-5437
Fax: (905) 333-5352
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:15 Nov 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics
McMaster University, 09 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 03 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Sep 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Feb 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2018 |
|
Active |