THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 3:41:43 AM
Kouwenberg, Jennifer Lara
CPSO#:
89551
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
26 Jul 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
30 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: J.L. Kouwenberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 11 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:QHC Regional Pediatrics Services Consulting Group
Suite 305
274 Dundas St E
Belleville ON K8N 1E6
Date Received: 26 Jul 2017
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 26 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 27 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 27 Aug 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 28 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jan 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 26 Jul 2017 |