THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 10:28:44 AM
Torres, Carlos Hernando
CPSO#:
89506
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Spanish
Education: Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
Department of Radiology
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 12036
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ottawa Hospital |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site |
Ottawa |
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site |
Ottawa |
Renfrew Victoria Hospital |
Renfrew |
Winchester District Memorial Hospital |
Winchester |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:19 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Neuroradiology |
Effective:19 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Dec 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Apr 2015 |
|
Active |