THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 4:23:35 AM
Nicholson, Naomi Louise
CPSO#:
89482
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
189 Kent Street West
Lindsay ON K9V 5G6
Phone: (705) 880-0501
Fax: (705) 880-0505
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:24 Jun 2010 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAOMI LOUISE NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Oct 2010 |