THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 19:21:53 PM
Lee, Jason Kihyuk
CPSO#:
89468
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Korean
Education: University of Toronto, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 920
123 Edward Street
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Phone: (647) 352-2554
Fax: (866) 881-7790
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Jul 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:02 Oct 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JASON KIHYUK LEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2009 |