skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 14:00:58 PM

Chong, Aun-Yeong Yeong

CPSO#: 89458

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 May 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 29 May 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of New South Wales, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 696 7280
Fax: (613) 696 7245 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aun-Yeong Chong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lim ( CPSO# 88120 )
Dr. A. Chong ( CPSO# 89458 )

Business Address:
University of Ottawa
Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 696-7280


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:29 May 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 May 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Apr 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Mar 2021 Active
 Dr. AUN-YEONG YEONG CHONG may practise medicine independently in cardiology.