THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:03:06 AM
Crombie, Kenneth Alexander Tighe
CPSO#:
89455
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
01 Jul 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Division of Emergency Medicine
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3594
Electoral District: 07
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario |
Ottawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:30 Jul 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Pediatric Emergency Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KENNETH ALEXANDER TIGHE CROMBIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CROMBIE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 31 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 29 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
University of Ottawa, 30 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Pediatric Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |