skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 17/10/21 0:01:04 AM

Seneviratne Atapattu, Yasanthie Shobamanie

CPSO#: 89394

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Kathmandu University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Innisfil Health Collaborative
Suite 2300
7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 2M6
Phone: (705) 436-2251
Fax: (705) 436-7991 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Y. S. Seneviratne Atapattu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Seneviratne Atapattu ( CPSO# 89394 )

Business Address:
31 Health Services Centre
0-166 - 30 Route Ortona Road
PO Box 1000 Station Main
Borden ON  L0M 1C0
Phone Number: (705) 424-1200

Business Address:
Innisfil Health Collaborative
2300-7325 Yonge Street
Innisfil ON  L9S 2M6
Phone Number: (705) 436-2251


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASANTHIE SHOBAMANIE SENEVIRATNE ATAPATTU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SENEVIRATNE ATAPATTU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2010