skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 21/09/20 14:45:47 PM

Almajid, Khalid Saeed M

CPSO#: 89357

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Feb 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Feb 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Saud University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone: (416) 242-1000 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Rutherford Medical Centre
5283 Rutherford Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2T2
Canada
Phone: 905-264-8311
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. K.S.M. Almajid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 08 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Almajid ( CPSO# 89357 )

Business Address:
3 - 1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON  M3M 0B2
Phone Number: (416) 242-1000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KHALID SAEED M ALMAJID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALMAJID is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2008
PEAP - Resident - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2008 to 30 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 31 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 21 Apr 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 22 Apr 2011 to 21 Apr 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 22 Apr 2012 to 12 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 13 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 20 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2017