THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 8:59:15 AM
Zayed, Rim
CPSO#:
89309
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of
29 Feb 2024
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
19 Sep 2023
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 20 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2010 to 20 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 21 Dec 2011 to 20 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Genetics and Genomics
University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2013 to 08 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 09 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 12 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 13 Dec 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 12 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Aug 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Dec 2021 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Jul 2022 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 31 Aug 2023 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 19 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Sep 2024 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 29 Feb 2024 |