skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 31/07/21 5:52:19 AM

Shalby, Moustafa Ahmed Moustafa Moustafa

CPSO#: 89280

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Sep 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
208-89 queensway west
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone: 9058493062 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

201-450 Bronte street
Mississauga ON  L9T 8T2
Canada
Phone: (905) 849-3062
Fax: (905) 8491449
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: M.A. Shalby Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shalby ( CPSO# 89280 )

Business Address:
201 - 450 Bronte Street
Milton ON  L9T 7X1
Phone Number: (905) 849-3062

Business Address:
208 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 849-3062

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOUSTAFA AHMED MOUSTAFA MOUSTAFA SHALBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHALBY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
AVP - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
CF - Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012