THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 1:11:55 AM
Ward, Richard
CPSO#:
89247
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of London, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Blood Disorders Program
9NU994
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-5233
Fax: (416) 340-3799
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematology |
Effective:16 Nov 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 15 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 16 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 May 2010
CF - Hematology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2017 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Nov 2017 |
|
Active |