THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 11:49:37 AM
Margarido, Clarita Bandeira
CPSO#:
89230
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Portuguese
Education: Faculdade De Ciencias Medicas Da Sta: Ca, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Obstetrical Anesthesia
Rm M5-318
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-6100
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Clarita Margarido Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 29 2021
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:04 May 2018 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Sep 2008
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 13 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 May 2018 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 May 2018 |
|
Active |