skip to content

THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date: 28/07/21 19:08:25 PM

Ebinu, Julius Okudu

CPSO#: 89219

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100-2 Toronto St
Suite 402
Toronto ON  M5C 2B5
Phone: (866) 830-9125 Ext. 201 Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California
USA - Connecticut
USA - New York

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIUS OKUDU EBINU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EBINU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014