THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/03/23 19:56:50 PM
Fink, Jennifer Leah
CPSO#:
89207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jun 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jun 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2008
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
P O Box 939 Promenade
Thornhill ON L4J 8G7
Ccanada
Phone: (647)497- 7322
Fax: (437)317- 9594
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JENNIFER LEAH FINK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FINK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jun 2016 |